Restitution

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0202Criminal Law - Malicious Destruction of Property - Transit VehiclesDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0250 / CH0363Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of RestitutionDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0291 / CH0465
    (SB0383 / CH0464)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0435Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RestitutionDelegate HowardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0541
    (SB0571)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of CompletionDelegate HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0737Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property by Graffiti - PenaltiesDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0866Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0921 / CH0652
    (SB0258)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0942 / CH0301
    (SB0624 / CH0300)
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care RecordsDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0258
    (HB0921 / CH0652)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeSenator ShankVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0383 / CH0464
    (HB0291 / CH0465)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0571
    (HB0541)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of RehabilitationSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0624 / CH0300
    (HB0942 / CH0301)
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care RecordsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 300Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0664Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0818Community Juvenile Services ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.