Review Boards

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0121 / CH0490Criminal Procedure - Drug-Related Offenses - Departure From Mandatory Minimum SentencesDelegate AndersonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0457Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or WitnessDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0574
    (SB0449 / CH0034)
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure RequirementsDelegate Robinson, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0677Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Independent Review Board - Refunds MC/PG 106-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0731Law Enforcement Officers - Disciplinary Actions - Written PolicyDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0755 / CH0136
    (SB0695 / CH0135)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0867Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State PolicyDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0968
    (SB0566)
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - AlterationsDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1198
    (SB0882 / CH0130)
Baltimore City Civilian Review BoardDelegate OaksIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0399Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice GuidelinesSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0449 / CH0034
    (HB0574)
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure RequirementsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0566
    (HB0968)
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - AlterationsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0695 / CH0135
    (HB0755 / CH0136)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0757 / CH0381Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required DisclosuresChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0882 / CH0130
    (HB1198)
Baltimore City Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.