Review Boards

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0370 / CH0353
    (SB0279 / CH0354)
Metro Board Member ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0600
    (SB0131)
Child Abuse and Neglect - TrainingDelegate McComasIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0652Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist OrdersDelegate WestIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0653 / CH0215
    (SB0522 / CH0216)
Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and RisksDelegate Young, K.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0819 / CH0253
    (SB0741)
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – AppealsDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0863 / CH0483
    (SB0698)
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and PracticeDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1145Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Issuance and AppealDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1193Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and EffectsDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1266
    (SB0950)
Health Occupations - Treatment of Lyme Disease and Other Tick-Borne Diseases - Disciplinary ActionsDelegate CareyIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1822Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police DepartmentDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0279 / CH0354
    (HB0370 / CH0353)
Metro Board Member ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 354Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0522 / CH0216
    (HB0653 / CH0215)
Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and RisksSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 216Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0552 / CH0757
    (HB0742 / CH0756)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 757Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0741
    (HB0819 / CH0253)
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – AppealsSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0950
    (HB1266)
Health Occupations – Treatment of Lyme Disease and Other Tick–Borne Diseases – Disciplinary ActionsSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1209
    (HB1158)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.