Robbery

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0326
    (SB0333)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0338 / CH0097Criminal Law - Robbery - Charging DocumentDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 97Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0477Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before JudgmentDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0478
    (SB0861)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0333
    (HB0326)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistrySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0861
    (HB0478)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.