Sales and Use Tax

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 38

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0052
    (SB0704)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0058Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College TextbooksDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0151Task Force on the Implementation of Tax Benefits for Emergency Preparedness EquipmentDelegate Miller, A.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0176Transportation Trust Fund Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0232 / CH0609Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Parent-Teacher Organization FundraisersDelegate VitaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 609Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0511Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - ExemptionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0523 / CH0484
    (SB0486 / CH0483)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawDelegate MyersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0666Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Week - School SuppliesDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0773Regulated Firearms - Encoded Ammunition - TaxDelegate BurnsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Public Safety (E4)
HB0815
    (SB0631 / CH0510)
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training CenterDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1085
    (SB0641)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1086
    (SB0576)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1162Sales and Use Tax - Luxury SurchargeDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1210Waterway Improvement Fund - Revenue Distributions - MarinasSenator HersheyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1214Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - ApplicationDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1277Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition - Developmental Disabilities FundingDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1302Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1487Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales PresumptionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1513 / CH0420
    (SB1037)
Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and TaxesDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0022Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and StairliftsSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0253Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0362Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation TaxSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0481 / CH0481Task Force on the Implementation of Tax Benefits for Emergency Preparedness EquipmentSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 481Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2013 - 11:30 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0486 / CH0483
    (HB0523 / CH0484)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0576
    (HB1086)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0631 / CH0510
    (HB0815)
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training CenterSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
SB0641
    (HB1085)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0643
    (HB0524)
End the GridlockSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0652Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit FundingSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0653Sales and Use Tax - Mass TransitSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0704
    (HB0052)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0745 / CH0313Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone Systems - Prepaid Service - Collection of SurchargeSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 313Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0829 / CH0422Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator MillerAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0830Transportation Financing ActSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB1037
    (HB1513 / CH0420)
Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and TaxesSenator KingIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.