Sales and Use Tax

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0020Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource OfficersDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0056Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - School Supplies and TextbooksDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0063Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College TextbooksDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0162
    (SB0172 / CH0464)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0347
    (SB0365)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0415Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition and Firearms - Developmental Disabilities FundingDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0429Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Week - School SuppliesDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0554
    (SB0625)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0718
    (SB0707)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014Delegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0784
    (SB0732)
Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup GeneratorsDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0786 / CH0424
    (SB0417)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Exemption for Light-Emitting Diode (LED) LightsDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0862Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1331
    (SB0765)
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1492Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014Delegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1515Sales and Use Tax - Definition of Taxable PriceDelegate HixsonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1520Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting GoodsDelegate ReadyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0009Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Veterans Organizations That Sell Marine Corps UniformsSenator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0172 / CH0464
    (HB0162)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations Operating Budget (B1)
SB0365
    (HB0347)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0386Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and StairliftsSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0394Statewide Container Recycling Refund ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0417
    (HB0786 / CH0424)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Exemption for Light-Emitting Diode (LED) LightsSenator DeGrangeIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0625
    (HB0554)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0707
    (HB0718)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0732
    (HB0784)
Income and Sales Tax Incentives - Emergency Preparedness EquipmentSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0765
    (HB1331)
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.