Sales and Use Tax

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 38

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0053Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety DevicesDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.Ways and Means
1/18/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0067
    (SB0159)
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - ExemptionDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
1/18/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0095Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - ExemptionChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0113Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - DefinitionDelegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0223Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Electricity Consumption by Small Business Located in Qualified Distressed CountyDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0394
    (SB0317 / CH0149)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017SpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0424
    (SB0304 / CH0379)
Taxpayer Protection ActSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0470
    (SB0235 / CH0230)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Service Performed by Person Practicing EngineeringDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0530 / CH0237
    (SB0622 / CH0236)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and BookbagsDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0552Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0713 / CH0718Sales and Use Tax - Light Rail Vehicles - ExemptionChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 718Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0728Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - ExtensionDelegate ArentzIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0796
    (SB0748)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy ScoutsDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0922
    (SB1132)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Sales by Nonprofit Organizations Raising Funds to Assist VeteransDelegate AndertonIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0935
    (SB0093)
Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection RequirementDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1112
    (SB0720)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - All-Terrain or Utility-Terrain Vehicles for Agricultural PurposesDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1186
    (SB0927)
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - CannabisDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1213
    (SB0855)
Main Street Fairness Act of 2017Delegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1242Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Bluetooth Headset or Hands-Free DeviceDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1245
    (SB0052)
Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - ExemptionDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1337Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1360
    (SB0449 / CH0663)
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee ExemptionDelegate HixsonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1618
    (SB1143)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Ellicott City and Ellicott's Mills Historic DistrictsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0052
    (HB1245)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Disposable Medical Supplies and CondomsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0093
    (HB0935)
Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection RequirementSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0157Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate ReductionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0159
    (HB0067)
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - ExemptionSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0235 / CH0230
    (HB0470)
Sales and Use Tax - Declaration of Legislative Intent - ServicesSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 230Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0304 / CH0379
    (HB0424)
Taxpayer Protection ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0317 / CH0149
    (HB0394)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0622 / CH0236
    (HB0530 / CH0237)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and BookbagsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 236Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0720
    (HB1112)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - All-Terrain or Utility-Terrain Vehicles for Agricultural PurposesSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0748
    (HB0796)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy ScoutsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0855
    (HB1213)
Main Street Fairness Act of 2017Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0927
    (HB1186)
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - CannabisSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB1073Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Utilities for Operation of RestaurantsSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB1132
    (HB0922)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Sales by Nonprofit Organizations Raising Funds to Assist VeteransSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB1143
    (HB1618)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Ellicott City and Ellicott's Mills Historic DistrictsSenator BatesIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:46 A.M.