Scholarships and Student Financial Aid

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0001 / CH0317
    (SB0185 / CH0316)
Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Student Assistance Grants for Child Care Providers - Hattie N. Harrison Memorial ScholarshipDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Ways and Means
1/28/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0011 / CH0215
    (SB0865)
Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Programs - EligibilityDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215Ways and Means
2/5/2015 - 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0047Special Education - Loan Assistance Repayment and Paraprofessional TrainingDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0057
    (SB0237)
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - StudiesDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0074 / CH0397Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Expansion of ScopeDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Ways and Means
2/5/2015 - 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0152
    (SB0535)
Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals - RequirementsDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0237
    (SB0095)
Workers' Compensation - Children's Scholarship Fund - EstablishmentDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB0297
    (SB0225 / CH0333)
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Tuition Exemption - ModificationDelegate Washington, M.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0538
    (SB0075)
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0578
    (SB0514)
Higher Education - Net Price Calculator Improvement Act - EstablishmentDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0648Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Full-Time Students - Partial State ReimbursementDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0673Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Full-Time Students - Full State ReimbursementDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0696Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2015Delegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0788
    (SB0669)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care RecipientsDelegate JalisiIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0041Higher Education - Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award - EligibilitySenator FergusonIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0075
    (HB0538)
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0095
    (HB0237)
Workers' Compensation - Children's Scholarship Fund - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0131Baltimore City Community College - Tuition Waivers - Graduates of Baltimore City Public High SchoolsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB0185 / CH0316
    (HB0001 / CH0317)
Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Student Assistance Grants for Child Care Providers - Hattie N. Harrison Memorial ScholarshipSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0225 / CH0333
    (HB0297)
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Tuition Exemption - ModificationSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0237
    (HB0057)
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - StudiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB0363Great Preschools Tax Credit ProgramSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0405Maryland Education CreditSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0514
    (HB0578)
Higher Education - Net Price Calculator Improvement Act - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0535
    (HB0152)
Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals - RequirementsSenator MadalenoIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0669
    (HB0788)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care RecipientsSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0810Higher Education - Programs in Dental Hygiene and Medical Laboratory Technology - Transfer of Students and Senatorial and Delegate ScholarshipsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0843University System of Maryland - Members of the Armed Forces - Financial AidSenator WaughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
SB0865
    (HB0011 / CH0215)
Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Programs - EligibilitySenator PetersVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.