Scholarships and Student Financial Aid

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0012Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Eligibility, Award Amounts, and Use of FundsDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0262Student Debt Disclosure Act of 2017Delegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0266 / CH0332
    (SB0327 / CH0331)
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction RestrictionsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0272Higher Education - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sanctuary Campus StatusDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0392Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Allocation of Unused FundsDelegate KrimmIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0394
    (SB0317 / CH0149)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017SpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0399
    (SB0320)
Student Debt Relief Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0462 / CH0321
    (SB0701 / CH0320)
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - AlterationsDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0509
    (SB0429)
Higher Education - Student Loan Notification LetterDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Passed EnrolledAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0623
    (SB0959)
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Certificate and License ProgramsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0716
    (SB0899)
Anne Arundel County - Board of EducationAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0848
    (SB0678)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition AssistanceDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0865Higher Education - Financial Aid - In-State Students (The Jill Wrigley Memorial Scholarship Expansion Act)Delegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0868
    (SB0869)
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and ScholarshipsDelegate JonesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0931Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017Delegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1033Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan DebtDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1289Higher Education - Student Financial Assistance - NotificationDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1357Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Related to Inventions and PatentsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1365County Student Loan Refinancing AuthoritiesDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansHigher Education (F2)
HB1576 / CH0311Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0213Maryland College Investment Plan - State Contribution to Account Holders - AlterationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0317 / CH0149
    (HB0394)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0320
    (HB0399)
Student Debt Relief Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0327 / CH0331
    (HB0266 / CH0332)
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction RestrictionsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0429
    (HB0509)
Higher Education - Student Loan Notification LetterSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0678
    (HB0848)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition AssistanceSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0701 / CH0320
    (HB0462 / CH0321)
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - AlterationsSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0712Historically Black Institutions - State Funding - Blount-Rawlings-Britt HBI Comparability ProgramSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0730Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - FarmersSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0869
    (HB0868)
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and ScholarshipsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0959
    (HB0623)
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Certificate and License ProgramsSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2017 12:14 P.M.