School Buses

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023
    (SB0341 / CH0696)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0186Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Repeat ViolationsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0259
    (SB0264)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From TollsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0263 / CH0683School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification RequirementDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 683Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0341Maryland Student Transportation Safety ActDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0495
    (SB0154 / CH0744)
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil PenaltyDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0943
    (SB0990)
Education - Privately Contracted School Bus Drivers - Annual Physical Examination RequirementDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1477Motor Vehicles - Wireless Communication Devices - Prohibited ActsDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0154 / CH0744
    (HB0495)
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil PenaltySenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 744Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0155School Vehicles - Seat Belts - RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0264
    (HB0259)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From TollsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0341 / CH0696
    (HB0023)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 696Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0342Driver's Licenses - School Bus Drivers - RequirementsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0990
    (HB0943)
Education - Privately Contracted School Bus Drivers - Annual Physical Examination RequirementSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:42 A.M.