Search and Seizure

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0255Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable AdultsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0306Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015Delegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0338
    (SB0173)
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and ReportingDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0360
    (SB0528)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureDelegate VallarioIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (87-51)Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0362
    (SB0393)
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of CostsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0616
    (SB0838 / CH0386)
St. Mary's County - Animal RegulationsSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0659Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0713Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - ProhibitionDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0876Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015)Delegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0918
    (SB0727)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1059
    (SB0686)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActDelegate Barnes, D.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1284Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full NamesDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0173
    (HB0338)
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and ReportingSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0393
    (HB0362)
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of CostsSenator RaskinIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0528
    (HB0360)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureSenator RaskinVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0686
    (HB1059)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0727
    (HB0918)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingSenator NormanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0838 / CH0386
    (HB0616)
St. Mary's County - Animal RegulationsSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.