Search and Seizure

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0519Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0739 / CH0802
    (SB0941 / CH0803)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - StandardsDelegate MoonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0917
    (SB0878)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologyDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1256
    (SB0982 / CH0487)
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - ReportDelegate JalisiIn the House - Third Reading Passed (98-21)Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1362
    (SB0835)
Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community TrustDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1372Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot ProgramDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1407Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full NamesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0068Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical CannabisSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0835
    (HB1362)
Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust ActSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0878
    (HB0917)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologySenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0941 / CH0803
    (HB0739 / CH0802)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - StandardsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0982 / CH0487
    (HB1256)
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - ReportSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.