Secretary of State

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0332
    (SB0185)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0448
    (SB0190 / CH0450)
State Government - Notary Public - AppointmentDelegate ReadyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0832
    (SB0361)
Congressional Districting ProcessDelegate NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1199Citizens' Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1427State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0185
    (HB0332)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0190 / CH0450
    (HB0448)
State Government - Notary Public - AppointmentSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0361
    (HB0832)
Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0376Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Safety (E4)
SB0706Referendum PetitionsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.