Securities

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0613Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned BusinessesDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0873
    (SB0659 / CH0720)
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of StockDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEconomic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0876
    (SB0498)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned BusinessesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1506 / CH0794Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited SeniorsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 794Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0498
    (HB0876)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned BusinessesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0778Procurement - Payment Security - Construction ContractsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0953Recordation Tax – Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation – DistributionSenator EckardtIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedBudget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:44 A.M.