Sediment Control

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0097 / CH0081Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - AuthorityChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81Environmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0400
    (SB0364)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0407
    (SB0325)
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control StandardsFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersEnvironment (M3)
HB0623Environment - Sediment Control - Agricultural Land Management PracticesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0706 / CH0384Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013Chair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 384Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0766 / CH0139Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - CertificationDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0325
    (HB0407)
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control StandardsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0364
    (HB0400)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0575 / CH0502Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - Annual ReportSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 502Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1029 / CH0339Maryland Agricultural Certainty ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.