Sediment Control

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0058 / CH0380
    (SB0073)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsDelegate Haddaway-RiccioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0878 / CH0430
    (SB0814)
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - SpecificationDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0910Water Quality Certification - Conowingo Dam - Required StudiesDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1463
    (SB1020)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Utility Regulation (C5)
HJ0006
    (SJ0004)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0073
    (HB0058 / CH0380)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsSenator ColburnVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0814
    (HB0878 / CH0430)
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - SpecificationSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB1020
    (HB1463)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1116Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SJ0004
    (HJ0006)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.