Service Stations

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0188Retail Service Stations - Disaster Preparation - Generator Tax CreditDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0817Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power SourcesDelegate MurphyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0835
    (SB0948)
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0962Motor Fuel Taxes - Consumer Disclosure RequirementsDelegate BatesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1436
    (SB0967)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredDelegate SwainIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0652Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit FundingSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0689Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power SourcesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0948
    (HB0835)
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0967
    (HB1436)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.