Service Stations

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0187Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0574
    (SB0487)
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor VehiclesDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1196
    (SB0065)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredDelegate SwainIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1311Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty RequirementsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1345 / CH0360
    (SB0908 / CH0359)
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax CreditsDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1383Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0065
    (HB1196)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0331
    (HB0295 / CH0262)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0487
    (HB0574)
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor VehiclesSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0631Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0788Income Tax Credit - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment - Retail Service Station DealersSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0908 / CH0359
    (HB1345 / CH0360)
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax CreditsSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.