Sewage

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0506Environment - Dental Mercury - Water or Sewerage Service Bill InsertDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0549
    (SB0145)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0569Environment - Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Financial Assistance StudyDelegate ElliottIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0598 / CH0623Water and Sewer Service - Billing PeriodDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 623Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0634Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0636 / CH0124Washington Suburban Sanitary District - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 103-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0640 / CH0126Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Notice Requirements MC/PG 115-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0641 / CH0127Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing MC/PG 113-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0642 / CH0628Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Posting Requirements MC/PG 114-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0824Environment - Sewer Overflow or Treatment Plant Bypass - Electronic NoticeDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0827Environment - Water Supply and Wastewater Infrastructure - FundDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1122Health - Food Service Facilities - Septic SystemsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1208Bay Restoration Fee - Exemption - On-Site Sewage Disposal System Using Best Available TechnologySenator HersheyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1243Environment - Water Pollution Control - PenaltiesDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1378
    (SB1017)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bethel Recreation CenterDelegate ProctorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1380Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Prince George's County - Bethel Recreation CenterDelegate ProctorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1525
    (SB1044)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Lake Arbor Center Water and Sewage Connection ProjectDelegate SwainIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0145
    (HB0549)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0157Baltimore City - Fees and Penalties for Unpaid Water and Sewer Usage Charges for Residential CustomersSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0302 / CH0222Environment - Water Pollution Control - ReportingSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0391
    (HB0106)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0500Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Nitrogen Removal Technology - ProhibitionSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0973Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Nitrogen Removal TechnologySenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1008Sewage Sludge Utilization Permits - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Judicial ReviewSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1017
    (HB1378)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bethel Recreation CenterSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1029 / CH0339Maryland Agricultural Certainty ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB1044
    (HB1525)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Lake Arbor Center Water and Sewage Connection ProjectSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:44 A.M.