Sexual Offenses

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 40

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0609Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Development and ImplementationDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 609Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0076 / CH0610Department of State Police - Investigation AuthorityChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0166 / CH0616Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Out-of-State Sex OffendersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0216
    (SB0289)
Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by MinorsDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0218Courts - Evidence of Prior Sexual Offense - AdmissibilityDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0266
    (SB0498)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0304
    (SB0243)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0374
    (SB0603 / CH0567)
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior CrimesDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0519
    (SB0903)
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights AbusesDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0634
    (SB0209)
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral ConsequencesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0646
    (SB0593)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0716Election Law - Voting by Felons at Polling Places - ProhibitionDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0751 / CH0629Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Court-Ordered Services ProviderDelegate SanchezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0757Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree MurderDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0822 / CH0633Criminal Law - Altering References From Mentally Defective to Substantially Cognitively Impaired IndividualDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 633Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0836Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to SafetyDelegate ArentzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0847Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - DefinitionDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0944Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1060Model Residential Leases - Required ContentsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1142Education - Institutions of Higher Learning - Affirmative Consent StandardDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB1186Sex Offender Registrants - School Polling Place - AlternativeDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1215
    (SB0069)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of LimitationsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1259Election Law - Voting by Registered Offenders at Polling Places - ProhibitionDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1357Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and ExceptionsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1578
    (SB0504)
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Threatening to Withhold Governmental ServicesDelegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0069
    (HB1215)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of LimitationsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0122Criminal Procedure - Reconsiderations of Sentences - ReportingSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0209
    (HB0634)
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral ConsequencesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0235Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - AdmissibilitySenator BrochinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0243
    (HB0304)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0289
    (HB0216)
Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by MinorsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0498
    (HB0266)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0504
    (HB1578)
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Threatening to Withhold Governmental ServicesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0593
    (HB0646)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0603 / CH0567
    (HB0374)
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior CrimesSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0656Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0903
    (HB0519)
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights AbusesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1023Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.