Sexual Orientation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0838 / CH0483
    (SB0416 / CH0482)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility ServicesDelegate HillEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0954 / CH0134Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - ReportsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0990
    (SB0834)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - StandardsDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0416 / CH0482
    (HB0838 / CH0483)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility ServicesSenator KaganEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0834
    (HB0990)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - StandardsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.