Sexual Orientation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0011 / CH0326
    (SB0001 / CH0325)
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - ExceptionDelegate HillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 326Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1003 / CH0557
    (SB0481 / CH0556)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1142Education - Institutions of Higher Learning - Affirmative Consent StandardDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB1172
    (SB0751)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1213Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1465Foster Care - Standards for Foster ParentsDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0001 / CH0325
    (HB0011 / CH0326)
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - ExceptionSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 325Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.