Signs and Billboards

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0286 / CH0083Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - SignsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 83Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0751Health - Food Allergy AwarenessDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB0760
    (SB0557)
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0764
    (SB0307)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Blair Regional Park ScoreboardsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0897Public Health - Synthetic Infill Turf Fields - Informational SignsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1153State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public LibrariesDelegate ProctorIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0086 / CH0323Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0307
    (HB0764)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Blair Regional Park ScoreboardsSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0557
    (HB0760)
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)Senator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.