Social Security

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0224 / CH0158
    (SB0279 / CH0157)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0333 / CH0367Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0505Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security NumberDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0514Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of InformationDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0789
    (SB0715 / CH0309)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013Delegate IveyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0849
    (SB0579)
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily AdjustmentDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0930Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0279 / CH0157
    (HB0224 / CH0158)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0650Natural Resources - Hunting License Applications - Social Security NumberSenator GettyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0715 / CH0309
    (HB0789)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013Senator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 309Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.