Social Security

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0378State Department of Education - Social Security Numbers of StudentsDelegate VogtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0524 / CH0815
    (SB0291 / CH0816)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate MoonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0580
    (SB0250)
Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government BenefitsDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0929Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross IncomeDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1113Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi SyndromeDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1615 / CH0408
    (SB1231)
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1638
    (SB0788)
Public Information Act - RevisionsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0291 / CH0816
    (HB0524 / CH0815)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0788
    (HB1638)
Public Information Act - RevisionsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB1231
    (HB1615 / CH0408)
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance ProgramSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsSocial Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 12:59 P.M.