Social Services

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0245 / CH0090Family Law - Substance-Exposed NewbornsChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0278
    (SB0265 / CH0037)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0327
    (SB0385 / CH0250)
State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic FormDelegate ReadyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0517
    (SB0434)
State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for ProposalsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0834Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug TestsDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB0890
    (SB0610 / CH0299)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentDelegate BromwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB0945Children's Cabinet in the Governor's Office for Children - Study on Health and Social Services Needs of JuvenilesDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0951Task Force to Study Social Impact BondsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0955 / CH0394
    (SB0888)
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1137
    (SB0898)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1297 / CH0330
    (SB0897 / CH0329)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1320 / CH0413Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - ExtensionDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1333Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1449Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term LimitsDelegate ReznikIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1460
    (SB1010)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesDelegate RudolphIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)
HB1492
    (SB0387)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0086 / CH0022Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of AssistanceChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0265 / CH0037
    (HB0278)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0385 / CH0250
    (HB0327)
State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic FormSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0387
    (HB1492)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0434
    (HB0517)
State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for ProposalsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0610 / CH0299
    (HB0890)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0686 / CH0526
    (HB0884)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0888
    (HB0955 / CH0394)
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator GaragiolaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0897 / CH0329
    (HB1297 / CH0330)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0898
    (HB1137)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1010
    (HB1460)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.