Social Workers

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0298 / CH0219Health Insurance - Licensed Clinical Professional Art Therapists - ReimbursementDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 219Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0352
    (SB1106 / CH0610)
Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapyDelegate ReznikVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0425 / CH0844
    (SB0651 / CH0843)
Public Schools - Suspensions and ExpulsionsDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0515Hospitals - Establishment of Substance Use Treatment Program - RequirementsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0519Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0869 / CH0580
    (SB0553)
Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection ActDelegate Howard, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0981
    (SB0664 / CH0690)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipAllegany County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1060State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Meetings and Timeliness of Certification and Licensure IssuanceDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1113
    (SB0988)
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker ActDelegate LamIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1183 / CH0548
    (SB0986 / CH0549)
State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0553
    (HB0869 / CH0580)
Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection ActSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0651 / CH0843
    (HB0425 / CH0844)
Public Schools - Suspensions and ExpulsionsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0664 / CH0690
    (HB0981)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 690Budget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0986 / CH0549
    (HB1183 / CH0548)
State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 549Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1106 / CH0610
    (HB0352)
Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapySenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.