Somerset County

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0147 / CH0253
    (SB0244)
Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - LegalizationDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0148 / CH0166
    (SB0134 / CH0165)
Somerset County - Sheriff - SalaryDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 166Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0149 / CH0168
    (SB0135 / CH0167)
Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense ReimbursementsDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0152
    (SB0136)
Somerset County - State's Attorney - SalaryDelegate OttoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0253 / CH0257
    (SB0309)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0298
    (SB0133)
Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - DurationDelegate OttoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0742Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1097
    (SB0729)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramEastern Shore DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1167 / CH0503
    (SB0680)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasDelegate BuckelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1168 / CH0504
    (SB0681)
Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasDelegate BuckelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 504Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0133
    (HB0298)
Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - DurationSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0134 / CH0165
    (HB0148 / CH0166)
Somerset County - Sheriff - SalarySenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165Judicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0135 / CH0167
    (HB0149 / CH0168)
Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense ReimbursementsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 167Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0136
    (HB0152)
Somerset County - State's Attorney - SalarySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0244
    (HB0147 / CH0253)
Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - LegalizationSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0309
    (HB0253 / CH0257)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0680
    (HB1167 / CH0503)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0681
    (HB1168 / CH0504)
Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0728
    (HB1143)
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler SystemsSenator MathiasIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0729
    (HB1097)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramSenator HersheyIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0738Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1061Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRulesHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.