Somerset County

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0329
    (SB0007)
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or FeesDelegate OttoIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
HB0330 / CH0174
    (SB0215 / CH0175)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0425 / CH0327
    (SB0356 / CH0328)
Somerset County - Fire Companies - AppropriationsDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 327Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0433 / CH0085Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing DateDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 85Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0465 / CH0086Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 86Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0486
    (SB1172)
Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done HouseDelegate OttoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0631 / CH0540Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - DistributionDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0007
    (HB0329)
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or FeesSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
SB0215 / CH0175
    (HB0330 / CH0174)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0352 / CH0084Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing DateSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0353 / CH0541Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0356 / CH0328
    (HB0425 / CH0327)
Somerset County - Fire Companies - AppropriationsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 328Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1172
    (HB0486)
Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done HouseSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:59 P.M.