State Aid

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2016Delegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0045State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment FinancingDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0090 / CH0093On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Operation and Maintenance Costs - Low-Income HomeownersDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Environment and Transportation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0209
    (SB1146)
Education - State Grant to Counties With Declining Student EnrollmentDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0285 / CH0258
    (SB0455)
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment FinancingDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0420 / CH0522
    (SB0417 / CH0521)
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)Delegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 522Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0445
    (SB0758 / CH0696)
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State SupplementDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0449
    (SB0375)
Relief From Budget MandatesSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB1018Prince George's County - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - Board of Health Approval PG 406-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1388Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1409
    (SB0263)
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park LandDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1433
    (SB0461)
Education - Prekindergarten Students - FundingDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1537 / CH0313Procurement - Priority of Purchasing Preferences - Individual With Disability Owned BusinessDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 313Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0263
    (HB1409)
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management AreasSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedBudget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0375
    (HB0449)
Relief From Budget MandatesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0413
    (HB1499)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and ReportingSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Health (J1)
SB0417 / CH0521
    (HB0420 / CH0522)
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)Senator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0455
    (HB0285 / CH0258)
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment FinancingSenator McFaddenIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0461
    (HB1433)
Education - Prekindergarten Students - FundingSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0758 / CH0696
    (HB0445)
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State SupplementSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0948Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsHuman Relations (D5)
SB1146
    (HB0209)
Education - State Grant to Counties With Declining Student EnrollmentSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.