State Police, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0038Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Applicant QualificationsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0211Public Safety - Handgun Permits - QualificationsDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0292 / CH0431Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of SunsetChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0294
    (SB0281 / CH0427)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0350 / CH0100Business Regulation - Outdoor Musical Festival Promoter License - Repeal of Safety Permit RequirementChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 100Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0375
    (SB0266)
Regulated Firearms - Database - Applications for Dealer's License - Record Keeping and Reporting RequirementsDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0383Gun Shops - Security Requirements for Regulated FirearmsDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0395Handguns - Permit Qualifications and Carrying on School Property - School GuardiansDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0436
    (SB0533)
Handguns - School Employees - Handgun Permits and Carrying Weapons on School PropertyDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0588
    (SB0473 / CH0474)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0678Department of State Police - Police Employees - Residency RequirementsDelegate DeBoyIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0773Regulated Firearms - Encoded Ammunition - TaxDelegate BurnsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Public Safety (E4)
HB0776
    (SB0544)
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales RecordsDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0809Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from DisqualificationDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0810Mental Health Professionals - Duty to Report Risk of Serious Harm - Firearm SafetyDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0894Firearms - Dealer's License and Handgun Permit Application FeesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0902 / CH0649
    (SB0751)
State Police Retirement System - Reemployment of RetireesDelegate GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 649Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0961State Government - Maryland Public Information Act - Required Denials Regarding Firearm Dealers, Owners, and Permit HoldersDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1103Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and ModificationsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1225Criminal Law - Drive-By Shooting - Forfeiture of Motor VehicleDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1275Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Firearm and Permit SurchargeDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1291
    (SB0554)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1300
    (SB0646)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Check - Armored Car Company EmployeesDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0222
    (HB0322)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0266
    (HB0375)
Regulated Firearms - Database - Applications for Dealer's License - Record Keeping and Reporting RequirementsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0445Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Requirements and LimitationsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0473 / CH0474
    (HB0588)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0533
    (HB0436)
Handguns - School Employees - Handgun Permits and Carrying Weapons on School PropertySenator JacobsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0544
    (HB0776)
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales RecordsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0554
    (HB1291)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0646
    (HB1300)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Check - Armored Car Company EmployeesSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0751
    (HB0902 / CH0649)
State Police Retirement System - Reemployment of RetireesSenator RobeyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:44 A.M.