Statutes of Limitation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 38

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0255 / CH0093Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0346 / CH0031
    (SB0216 / CH0030)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0509Maryland False Claims Act of 2013Delegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0531Criminal Law - Mail Theft - PenaltyDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0575
    (SB0228)
Criminal Law - Use of Handgun in Crime of Violence or Felony - Statute of LimitationsDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0699
    (SB0416)
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0735
    (SB0698)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0920Tax Liens - EnforceabilityDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0967Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of LimitationsDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1075
    (SB0657)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of AuthorityDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1130 / CH0541
    (SB0758 / CH0540)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentDelegate BarnesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1141Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1215 / CH0408Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - StudyDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1263
    (SB0894)
Prosecution of Offenses Related to Practicing Medicine Without a License - Statute of Limitations - RepealDelegate FrankIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1271Courts - Unauthorized Use of Name or LikenessDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1287Public-Private Partnerships - Appeals Jurisdiction and Time RequirementsDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1314
    (SB0681)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on ClaimsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1475
    (SB1070)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0167Residential Condominiums - Governing Documents - Claims ProvisionsSenator KelleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0216 / CH0030
    (HB0346 / CH0031)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0228
    (HB0575)
Criminal Law - Use of Handgun in Crime of Violence or Felony - Statute of LimitationsSenator FroshIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0416
    (HB0699)
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0657
    (HB1075)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of AuthoritySenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0664Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0681
    (HB1314)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on ClaimsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0698
    (HB0735)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0727Members of the General Assembly - Whistleblower ProtectionSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0758 / CH0540
    (HB1130 / CH0541)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0810Coaches - Sexual Contact with Minors - ProhibitionSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0816Courts - Civil Action for Embezzlement by EmployeeSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0879Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0894
    (HB1263)
Prosecution of Offenses Related to Practicing Medicine Without a License - Statute of Limitations - RepealSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0970Private Property Rights - Regulatory Infringement - CompensationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB1070
    (HB1475)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.