Statutes of Limitation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0276
    (SB0222)
Human Trafficking - Civil Actions - Statute of LimitationsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0428
    (SB0574)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0641Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of DamagesDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0642 / CH0012
    (SB0505)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsDelegate Wilson, C.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0653Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0676
    (SB0670)
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing DocumentsDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0755
    (SB0810)
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for FilingDelegate MoonIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0836Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law BatteryDelegate FoldenIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0852Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations PeriodDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0881Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0994
    (SB1077)
Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under SealDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1037
    (SB0166)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardDelegate AndersonIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1148Face Recognition ActDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1149
    (SB0951)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsDelegate KramerIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HJ0005Extension of Statutes of Limitations Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964Delegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0222
    (HB0276)
Human Trafficking - Civil Actions - Statute of LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0259Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance EntitySenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0387Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0505
    (HB0642 / CH0012)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0574
    (HB0428)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Senator FeldmanIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0585Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0670
    (HB0676)
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing DocumentsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0810
    (HB0755)
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for FilingSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0951
    (HB1149)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0958Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1027Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations PeriodSenator MannoIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1077
    (HB0994)
Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under SealSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 11, 2017 12:18 A.M.