Storage

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0908 / CH0715
    (SB0271 / CH0716)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilityDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 715Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0139 / CH0414Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 414Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0271 / CH0716
    (HB0908 / CH0715)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilitySenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 716Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.