Subpoenas

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0244 / CH0089Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena PowerChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0346 / CH0031
    (SB0216 / CH0030)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0474
    (SB0611)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0570State Government - Inspector GeneralDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0806 / CH0391Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 391Health and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1029
    (SB0783)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1096 / CH0401
    (SB0672)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1481
    (SB0557 / CH0287)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0169Criminal Procedure - Reports to Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers Organization - Inadmissibility and ConfidentialitySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0216 / CH0030
    (HB0346 / CH0031)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0557 / CH0287
    (HB1481)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0611
    (HB0474)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0672
    (HB1096 / CH0401)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0783
    (HB1029)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0891Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's EstateSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.