Support of Dependents

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0505Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security NumberDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0514Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of InformationDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0541
    (SB0571)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of CompletionDelegate HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0662Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on PayoutsDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB0715
    (SB0620)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0777
    (SB0505 / CH0487)
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash BailDelegate Kelly, K.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0792 / CH0059
    (SB0507 / CH0058)
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child SupportWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0849
    (SB0579)
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily AdjustmentDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1518Pension and Retirement Health Benefits - Child Support Enforcement Administration Employees - Transferees from Baltimore City State's Attorney's OfficeDelegate ClippingerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0071Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement PlansChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0178Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of PaternityChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0181Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support ObligationChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0505 / CH0487
    (HB0777)
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash BailSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0507 / CH0058
    (HB0792 / CH0059)
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child SupportSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0571
    (HB0541)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of RehabilitationSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0579
    (HB0849)
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily AdjustmentSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0620
    (HB0715)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0650Natural Resources - Hunting License Applications - Social Security NumberSenator GettyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.