Swimming Pools

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0364 / CH0107Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law)Delegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1351Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - ProhibitionDelegate BromwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.