Swimming Pools

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0302
    (SB0025)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Woods Community CenterDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0767
    (SB0714)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor PoolCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0777Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0923
    (SB0685)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Swim and Fitness CenterDelegate GilchristIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0938Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Hillcrest Heights Community Center PoolDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1101 / CH0131Municipal Corporations - Closed Swimming Lake - Regulation MC 32-16Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 131Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0025
    (HB0302)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Woods Community CenterSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0685
    (HB0923)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Swim and Fitness CenterSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0714
    (HB0767)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor PoolCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.