Telephones

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0219Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and ReportingDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0306Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015Delegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0350Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0367 / CH0416
    (SB0469)
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response SystemDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB0453Public Utilities - Telephone Service - Battery for Backup PowerDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0472 / CH0250
    (SB0207)
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory RequirementsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0494Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by SummonsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0504Telephone Communications Consumer Protection ActDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0506
    (SB0410 / CH0168)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetyDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0541 / CH0431Public Service Commission - Attachments to Utility Poles - StudyDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0691Homeowner's Insurance - Notices to Policyholders - RequiredDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0853Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip ProgramsDelegate ArentzIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0992
    (SB0672)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1022
    (SB0609)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - EstablishmentDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB10302-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or HotlineDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1080 / CH0116
    (SB0576)
9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Multiple-Line Telephone Systems - Direct Dial (Kari's Law)Delegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1094Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeDelegate SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1163Consumer Protection - Maryland Telephone Consumer Protection ActDelegate GlennIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1166
    (SB0577)
Public Utilities - Telecommunications Law - ModernizationDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0207
    (HB0472 / CH0250)
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory RequirementsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0410 / CH0168
    (HB0506)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetySenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0469
    (HB0367 / CH0416)
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response SystemSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0576
    (HB1080 / CH0116)
9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Multiple-Line Telephone Systems - Direct Dial (Kari's Law)Senator PughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0577
    (HB1166)
Public Utilities - Telecommunications Law - ModernizationSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0609
    (HB1022)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot ProgramSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0672
    (HB0992)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramSenator YoungIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0900Public Health - Abortions - Physician RequirementsSenator WaughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.