Telephones

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0041Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip ProgramsDelegate ArentzIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0212Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - PenaltiesDelegate TurnerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0305Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeDelegate SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0365 / CH0262Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - UpdateDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0439 / CH0485Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door SalesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0512
    (SB0430)
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification RightsDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0744Senior Call-Check Service Program - EstablishmentDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0771 / CH0277
    (SB0071)
Public Schools - Administration of Diabetes Care Services - GuidelinesDelegate Barnes, D.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1066Montgomery County Public Schools - Communications in Spanish MC 37-16Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1103Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapyDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1120Family Law - Automatic InjunctionDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1266
    (SB0881)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and ResalesDelegate FrickIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1379
    (SB0813)
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1601Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement OfficerDelegate ClusterIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0071
    (HB0771 / CH0277)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramSenator YoungIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0424Emergency Number Systems Board - 9-1-1 Trust Fund - Planning CostsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0430
    (HB0512)
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification RightsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0657Task Force to Study the Impact of Cell Phone Use in Public SchoolsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0686Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Information Sharing (Carl Henn's Law)Senator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0690State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Election and Certification of Exclusive RepresentativesSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0813
    (HB1379)
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0881
    (HB1266)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and ResalesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1084Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting RequirementsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.