Telephones

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0242Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - PenaltyDelegate TurnerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0258
    (SB0221 / CH0646)
Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting RequirementsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Third Reading Passed (130-0)Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0352
    (SB1106 / CH0610)
Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapyDelegate ReznikVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0362Consumer Protection - Recurring Automatic Orders - Notice of Method of Contract CancellationDelegate ConawayIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0601 / CH0673
    (SB0248)
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - EstablishmentDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 673Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0620State Government - Toll-Free Calling to Units - RepealDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0658
    (SB0570)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - RequirementsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0669 / CH0197Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Electronic Tip ProgramsDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0843
    (SB0635)
Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While DrivingDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0963
    (SB0139)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - CollectionDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0968Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and SignageDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0983 / CH0765Health Insurance - Health Care Services Delivered Through Telehealth - CoverageDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 765Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0999 / CH0532
    (SB0649 / CH0533)
Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - RevisionsDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 532Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1165Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family RelationshipsDelegate SaabIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1221Public Utilities - Residential Copper Landline Replacement - Moratorium and StudyDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1242Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Bluetooth Headset or Hands-Free DeviceDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1329 / CH0571
    (SB0967 / CH0572)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Delegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 571Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1359Prohibition on Use of Wireless Communication and Text-Messaging Devices While Driving - Enforcement - StudyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0139
    (HB0963)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - CollectionSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0221 / CH0646
    (HB0258)
Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting RequirementsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 646Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0248
    (HB0601 / CH0673)
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - EstablishmentSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0466Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)Senator KaganIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0570
    (HB0658)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - RequirementsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0635
    (HB0843)
Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While DrivingSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0649 / CH0533
    (HB0999 / CH0532)
Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - RevisionsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0967 / CH0572
    (HB1329 / CH0571)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1106 / CH0610
    (HB0352)
Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapySenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.