Telephones

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0042Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - PenaltyDelegate TurnerIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0047 / CH0199
    (SB0090 / CH0200)
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – ModificationsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 199Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0328
    (SB0121 / CH0501)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0633 / CH0423
    (SB0578 / CH0424)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0677 / CH0039
    (SB0477 / CH0040)
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone NumbersDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0768Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - DisclosureDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0922 / CH0211Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose ReportDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0943Telephone Companies - Unpublished Telephone Number - One-Time ChargeDelegate SaabIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1090 / CH0515Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018Delegate AfzaliApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1285Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Security Freezes - Call CenterDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1323Consumer Protection - Cellular Telephones - DisclosureDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1386 / CH0032Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone NumberDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1483 / CH0287Duties of a Guardian of the Person - VisitationDelegate SaabApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1521Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - BluetoothDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1585
    (SB0511)
Civil Actions - Active Duty Service Members - Electronic Deposition and TestimonyDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1828Address Confidentiality Programs - Obtaining or Disclosing Protected Information - Prohibitions and PenaltiesDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)
SB0090 / CH0200
    (HB0047 / CH0199)
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – ModificationsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 200Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0103Task Force to Study the Impact of Student Cell Phone Use in the ClassroomSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0121 / CH0501
    (HB0328)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0477 / CH0040
    (HB0677 / CH0039)
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone NumbersSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0511
    (HB1585)
Civil Actions – Active Duty Service Members – Electronic Deposition and TestimonySenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0973 / CH0547Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - CollectionSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB1051Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Trust Fund and Fees (Carl Henn's Law)Senator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB10529-1-1 Trust Fund - Public Safety Answering Point - Mandatory ReportingSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1053 / CH0735Property Tax Credit - 9-1-1 Public Safety TelecommunicatorsSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 735Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:36 A.M.