Theaters

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0571Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Opera House RenovationsDelegate JamesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0582
    (SB0308)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patricia and Arthur Modell Performing Arts Center at the LyricDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0609
    (SB0597)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre CenterDelegate KaiserIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0982
    (SB0095)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare Company's Downtown TheatreDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1085
    (SB0641)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1226
    (SB1027)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Metropolitan Ballet Theatre Relocation and ExpansionDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1359
    (SB0903)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Montgomery County - Old Blair High School AuditoriumDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
SB0095
    (HB0982)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare Company's Downtown TheatreSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0308
    (HB0582)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patricia and Arthur Modell Performing Arts Center at the LyricSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0445Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Requirements and LimitationsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0597
    (HB0609)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre CenterSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0641
    (HB1085)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0866Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the ArtsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0903
    (HB1359)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Montgomery County - Old Blair High School AuditoriumSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1027
    (HB1226)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Metropolitan Ballet Theatre Relocation and ExpansionSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.