Torts

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0130
    (SB0263)
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and ExpensesChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0600
    (SB0502)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and FinanceHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB0959
    (SB0676 / CH0304)
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of InformationDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1156
    (SB0819)
Maryland Contributory Negligence ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1182Courts - Commission to Study Maryland's Fault Allocation SystemDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0263
    (HB0130)
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and ExpensesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0502
    (HB0600)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0676 / CH0304
    (HB0959)
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of InformationSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0711Local Government Tort Claims Act - Primary Care Coalition of Montgomery CountySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0819
    (HB1156)
Maryland Contributory Negligence ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.