Torts

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0219 / CH0046Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims ActCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Judiciary
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0601
    (SB0248)
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - EstablishmentDelegate KramerIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0642 / CH0012
    (SB0505)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsDelegate Wilson, C.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0903
    (SB0705)
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional RightDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1353Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Damages Sustained on Artificial or Synthetic Turf Playing FieldsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1373
    (SB0336)
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim RequirementDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0106 / CH0045Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims ActSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0144Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance CoverageSenator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0336
    (HB1373)
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim RequirementSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0505
    (HB0642 / CH0012)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0510Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for FilingSenator NormanIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0585Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0705
    (HB0903)
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional RightSenator MuseIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2017 4:30 P.M.