Tourism

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1337 / CH0530
    (SB0702 / CH0529)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1395Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxDelegate JamesIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
SB0702 / CH0529
    (HB1337 / CH0530)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Finance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.