Towing

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0781 / CH0388
    (SB0987)
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - NoticeDelegate GilchristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0886Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning DevicesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1127 / CH0303
    (SB0634 / CH0302)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1339Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of PaymentDelegate MinnickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1488Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned VehiclesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0378Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle on Approach of Tow TruckSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0634 / CH0302
    (HB1127 / CH0303)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0987
    (HB0781 / CH0388)
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - NoticeSenator ForehandIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.