Transfer Tax

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0596Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program CorporationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0970
    (SB0689 / CH0047)
Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy SheriffsDelegate Barnes, D.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1178 / CH0301Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of TrustDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0689 / CH0047
    (HB0970)
Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy SheriffsSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0766 / CH0197Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Rate DeterminationSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.