Treasurers

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0202 / CH0268
    (SB0255 / CH0267)
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement ExemptionDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0430
    (SB0306)
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0503 / CH0004
    (SB0371 / CH0550)
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization AccountDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4Appropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0679 / CH0296
    (SB0395 / CH0297)
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - PersonnelSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 296Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0682
    (SB0298 / CH0428)
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - SalariesSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0882
    (SB0805)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersDelegate KrimmIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationEthics (G2)
HB1345 / CH0523National Capital Strategic Economic Development FundDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1373
    (SB0336)
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim RequirementDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0039Somerset County - Code of Public Local Laws - Cross-References and CorrectionsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/12/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0255 / CH0267
    (HB0202 / CH0268)
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement ExemptionSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
2/2/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0298 / CH0428
    (HB0682)
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - SalariesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0306
    (HB0430)
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0336
    (HB1373)
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim RequirementSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0371 / CH0550
    (HB0503 / CH0004)
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization AccountSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0395 / CH0297
    (HB0679 / CH0296)
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - PersonnelSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 297Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0805
    (HB0882)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 30, 2017 1:02 P.M.