Trees

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0572 / CH0620Natural Resources - Tree Expert License - QualificationsDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 620Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0587 / CH0122Electric Companies - Service Quality and Reliability Standards - Vegetation ManagementDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0623Environment - Sediment Control - Agricultural Land Management PracticesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0706 / CH0384Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013Chair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 384Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0728
    (SB0211)
Natural Resources - Tree Experts - ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0927
    (SB0692)
Licensed Tree Expert - License Renewal - Continuing Education RequirementDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0936 / CH0655Natural Resources - Maryland Botanical Heritage WorkgroupDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1084 / CH0323
    (SB0797 / CH0322)
Thermal Energy - Task Force and RegulationsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Economic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1102
    (SB0684)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying BiomassDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0073 / CH0018Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening StandardsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0211
    (HB0728)
Natural Resources - Tree Experts - ProhibitionSenator ShankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0684
    (HB1102)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying BiomassSenator GaragiolaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0692
    (HB0927)
Licensed Tree Expert - License Renewal - Continuing Education RequirementSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0797 / CH0322
    (HB1084 / CH0323)
Thermal Energy - Task Force and RegulationsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Finance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.